Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971318

EP0971318 - Device for extrapolation from cone beam projection data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.08.2005
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Patch, Sarah Kathryn
52 Lincoln Avenue No. 3
Saratoga Spring, New York 12866 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Goode, Ian Roy , et al
London Patent Operation
General Electric International, Inc.
15 John Adam Street
London
WC2N 6LU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Goode, Ian Roy , et al
London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London
WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2000/02]Goode, Ian Roy , et al
GE LONDON PATENT OPERATION, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date99305428.708.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateUS1998011384110.07.1998         Original published format: US 113841
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971318
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0971318
Date:04.12.2002
[2002/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971318
Date:06.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06T11/00
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   NL [2003/35]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Extrapolierung von Kegelstrahlprojektionsdaten[2000/02]
English:Device for extrapolation from cone beam projection data[2000/02]
French:Dispositif d'extrapolation de données de projection de faisceaux coniques[2000/02]
Examination procedure04.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/32]
30.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.06.2004Fee for grant paid
09.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
02.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0521689  (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 1, line 26 - line 50 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9203970  (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 9 * * page 2, line 15 - line 19 * * page 3, line 28 - line 32 * * page 5, line 15 - line 25 * * page 6, line 30 - line 32 * * claims 1,2,5 *;
 [A]  - KEINERT, FRITZ, "Inversion of k-plane transforms and applications in computer tomography", SIAM REVIEW, vol. 31, (1989), pages 273 - 298, URL: www.math.iastate.edu/keinert/papers/kplane.pdf, (20020920), XP002215256 [A] 1-20 * section "1. Introduction" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1137/1031051