Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971316

EP0971316 - Spatially-selective edge enhancement for discrete pixel images [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.06.2009
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kump, Kenneth Scott
614 Crestwood Drive
Waukesha, Winsconsin 53188 / US
02 / Aufrichtig, Richard
2500 North 124th Street, No. 105
Wauwatosa, Winsconsin 53226 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Goode, Ian Roy , et al
London Patent Operation
General Electric International, Inc.
15 John Adam Street
London
WC2N 6LU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Goode, Ian Roy , et al
London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London
WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2000/02]Goode, Ian Roy , et al
GE LONDON PATENT OPERATION, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date99305432.908.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateUS1998011365310.07.1998         Original published format: US 113653
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971316
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0971316
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06T5/00
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   NL [2000/40]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Räumlich selektive Randverbesserung für Bilder mit diskreten Bildelementen[2000/02]
English:Spatially-selective edge enhancement for discrete pixel images[2000/02]
French:Amélioration des bords spatialement sélectif pour des images à pixels discrets[2000/02]
Examination procedure19.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
21.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/30]
06.03.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2009/30]
Request for further processing for:08.11.2005Request for further processing filed
08.11.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.11.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
02.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
01.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
31.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
31.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200810   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0444874  (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [Y] 1-21 * abstract * * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 17 * * column 5, line 14 - column 7, line 18 *;
 [Y]EP0527525  (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [Y] 1-21 * column A * * page 3, line 55, paragraph 5 - page 4, line 16 * * page 7, line 15 - line 40 *;
 [PA]WO9855916  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [PA] 1-21 * column A * * page 1, line 23 - page 5, line 32 *;
 [A]EP0368162  (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]) [A] 1-21 * column A * * column 2, line 50 - column 5, line 8 *