blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0971119 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0971119



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 221
27.07.2005 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
12.08.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
01.07.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.07.2004 Translation of priority document Search / examination 60
01.07.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
01.07.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
15.06.2004 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
29.03.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
29.03.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
29.03.2004 Invitation to file a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
29.03.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 52
29.12.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
29.12.2003 Description Search / examination 3
29.12.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.12.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
19.08.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
19.08.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
19.08.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.08.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.05.2002 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
19.02.2002 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
02.01.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
02.01.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.01.2002 European search report Search / examination 1
01.12.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
15.11.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.07.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.07.1999 Claims Search / examination 4
08.07.1999 Description Search / examination 36
08.07.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.07.1999 Drawings Search / examination 14
08.07.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7