blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0971119
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2000027725Global Dossier 25.01.2000A
Priority number Date
JP19348898 08.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0971119Global Dossier 22.09.2004B1
EP0971119 13.02.2002A3
EP0971119 12.01.2000A2
Priority number Date
JP19348898 08.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69920338T 06.10.2005T2
DE69920338D 28.10.2004D1
Priority number Date
JP19348898 08.07.1998