Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971119

EP0971119 - Common-rail fuel-injection system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.07.2005
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.09.2005  [2005/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Isuzu Motors Limited
26-1, Minami-ohi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
ISUZU MOTORS LIMITED
26-1, Minami-ohi 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Minato, Akihiko, c/o Isuzu Motors Ltd
Fujisawa Factory, 8 Tuchidana
Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Jenkins, Peter David , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Jenkins, Peter David , et al
PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Application number, filing date99305441.008.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateJP1998019348808.07.1998         Original published format: JP 19348898
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971119
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0971119
Date:13.02.2002
[2002/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971119
Date:22.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.01.2002
ClassificationInternational:F02M47/02, F02D41/38
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/44]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Common-Rail-Kraftstoffeinspritzsystem[2000/02]
English:Common-rail fuel-injection system[2000/02]
French:Système d'injection de combustible à rampe commune[2000/02]
Examination procedure21.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/30]
19.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2004Fee for grant paid
01.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US5133645  (CROWLEY PATRICK J [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * column 3, line 26 - line 68 * * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 39; figures 1,4,5 *;
 [X]US5713326  (HUBER GERD [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 4, line 40 - column 6, line 63; figures 1-5 *;
 [YA]EP0829641  (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,3,4 * column 3, line 13 - column 5, line 1; figures 1,5 * [A] 6,7;
 [YA]EP0826876  (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,5 * column 11, lines 3-20; figures 1,4,5 * [A] 6,7
 [YA]  RUMPHORST M, "EIN NEUES ELEKTRONISCHES HOCHDRUCK-EINSPRITZSYSTEM FUR DIESELMOTOREN A NEW ELECTRONIC HIGH PRESSURE INJECTION SYSTEM", MTZ MOTORTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, FRANCKH'SCHE VERLAGSHANDLUNG,ABTEILUNG TECHNIK. STUTTGART, DE, (19950301), vol. 56, no. 3, ISSN 0024-8525, pages 142 - 148, XP000490673 [Y] 1-5 * the whole document * [A] 6,7