Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974530

EP0974530 - Packaging member [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Illinois Tool Works Inc.
3600 West Lake Avenue
Glenview, IL 60026 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/52]For all designated states
ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC.
3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview
Illinois 60025-5811 / US
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC.
3600 West Lake Avenue
Glenview, Illinois 60025-5811 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Loeschen, Michael D.
44 Gentry, Hawthorn Woods
Illinois 60047 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Finnie, Peter John , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/45]Finnie, Peter John , et al
Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2000/04]Rackham, Stephen Neil
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date99305466.709.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateUS1998011919820.07.1998         Original published format: US 119198
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974530
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974530
Date:28.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B65D81/05
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:Verpackungselement[2000/04]
English:Packaging member[2000/04]
French:Elément d' emballage[2000/04]
Examination procedure24.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
08.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2005Fee for grant paid
25.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY28.12.2005
FI28.12.2005
MC31.07.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2007/21]FI28.12.2005
MC31.07.2006
Former [2006/24]FI28.12.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]DE9410321U  (ROMBERG EDM & SOHN [DE]) [X] 1-10 * page 5, line 24 - page 9, line 32 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]EP0483050  (ABEL GUENTHER [DE]) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 55 - page 4, line 30 * * figures 1-7 *
by applicantUS4976374