EP0972715 - Fastener assembly for plastics bag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook County Illinois 60025 / US | ||
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook County, Illinois 60025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnson, James R. 3819 Greenhill Drive Chamblee, GA 30341 / US | [2007/13] |
Former [2000/03] | 01 /
Johnson, James R. 3819 Greenhill Drive Chamblee, Georgia 30341 / US | Representative(s) | Finnie, Peter John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Finnie, Peter John, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2000/03] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99305468.3 | 09.07.1999 | [2000/03] | Priority number, date | US19980116087 | 15.07.1998 Original published format: US 116087 | [2000/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0972715 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0972715 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65D33/25 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
B65D33/2575 (EP,US);
B65B41/16 (EP,US);
B65B61/188 (EP,US);
B65B9/20 (EP,US);
B65B9/213 (EP,US);
B65D33/004 (EP,US);
B65D33/2533 (EP,US);
B65D33/2541 (EP,US);
A44B19/16 (EP,US);
B29C53/48 (EP,US);
B31B70/8133 (EP,US);
B65B9/2056 (EP,US);
B65D2401/10 (EP,US);
B65D2401/15 (EP,US);
Y10S24/50 (US);
Y10T24/45152 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/03] | Title | German: | Befestigungselement für eine Kunststofftasche | [2000/03] | English: | Fastener assembly for plastics bag | [2000/03] | French: | Ensemble de fixation pour sac en plastique | [2000/03] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 13.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 28.03.2007 | CH | 28.03.2007 | CY | 28.03.2007 | DK | 28.03.2007 | FI | 28.03.2007 | LI | 28.03.2007 | GR | 29.06.2007 | IE | 09.07.2007 | LU | 09.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | PT | 28.08.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/45] | BE | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
IE | 09.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | BE | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | BE | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | BE | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1092452 (MARGARETE JASTER, et al) [A] 1-7,10,11,13-19,21,23,26,31,32 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]GB2037704 (UNION CARBIDE CORP) [A] 1-10,13-19,21,23,26,29-32 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0398732 (REYNOLDS CONSUMER PROD [US]) [A] 1-7,10-17,19-21,31,32* page -; figure - *; | [A]WO9706062 (YEAGER JAMES WORTH [US]) [A] 22-25,27-30 * abstract * | by applicant | US4264288 | US4528224 | US4909017 | US4993844 | US5071689 | US5509734 | WO9706062 |