blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1008918

EP1008918 - Duplex printing apparatus and control method of the same apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.11.2003
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.01.2004  [2004/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/01]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Former [2000/24]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hirao, Naoto, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP
[2000/24]
Representative(s)Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London
WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date99305478.209.07.1999
[2000/24]
Priority number, dateJP1998034849008.12.1998         Original published format: JP 34849098
[2000/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1008918
Date:14.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1008918
Date:19.09.2001
[2001/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1008918
Date:02.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.08.2001
ClassificationIPC:G03G15/23
[2000/24]
CPC:
G03G15/231 (EP,US); G03G15/2032 (EP,US); G03G2215/00459 (EP,US);
G03G2215/2083 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/23]
Former [2000/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Doppelseitigerdrucker und Steuerungsverfahren dafür[2000/24]
English:Duplex printing apparatus and control method of the same apparatus[2000/24]
French:Appareil d'impression recto-verso et méthode de contrôle de cet appareil[2000/24]
Examination procedure31.10.2001Examination requested  [2002/01]
20.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.2002Fee for grant paid
16.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[E]EP1001317  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [E] 1,10 * column 8, line 30 - column 9, line 14; figures 1,4 *;
 [A]EP0866379  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1,10 * column 6, lines 1-30; figures 3A,,10 *;
 [A]JPH04149494
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920910), vol. 016, no. 433, Database accession no. (P - 1418), & JP04149494 A 19920522 (SATO:KK) [A] 1,10 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.