Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973364

EP0973364 - Self-shearing stencil [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.05.2004
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FORD MOTOR COMPANY
The American Road
Dearborn, MI 48121 / US
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Lin, Jin Her
45091 Lothrop Ct.
Canton, Michigan 48188 / US
02 / Glovatsky, Andrew Zachary
37803, Arbor Wood Drive
Livonia, Michigan 48150 / US
03 / Trublowski, John
3949, Highland
Troy, Michigan 48083 / US
04 / Jairazbhoy, Vivek Amir
31122, Pine Cone Drive
Farmington Hills, Michigan 48331 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Messulam, Alec Moses , et al
Harrison IP Limited
3 Ebor House
London Ebor Business Park
Millfield Lane
Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Messulam, Alec Moses , et al
A. Messulam & Co. Ltd. 43-45 High Road Bushy Heath Bushy
Hertfordshire WD23 1EE / GB
Former [2000/03]Messulam, Alec Moses , et al
A. Messulam & Co. Ltd., 24 Broadway
Leigh-on-Sea, Essex SS9 1BN / GB
Application number, filing date99305479.009.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateUS1998011411813.07.1998         Original published format: US 114118
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0973364
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0973364
Date:13.06.2001
[2001/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:H05K3/12, B41N1/24
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB [2002/10]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Selbstabscherende Schablone[2000/03]
English:Self-shearing stencil[2000/03]
French:Pochoir à auto-cisaillement[2000/03]
Examination procedure17.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/50]
03.05.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0267359  (IBM) [A] 1,7 * page 8, line 13 - line 30; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]WO9748020  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV ;PHILIPS NORDEN AB (SE)) [A] 1,7 * figure - *;
 [A]GB2320462  (MICRO METALLIC LTD) [A] 1,7 * figure - *;
 [A]US4791006  (GALVAGNI ET AL.) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]GB2307446  (IBM) [A] * figure - *;
 [DA]US4872261  (SANYAL ET AL.) [DA] * figure - *