blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0978320

EP0978320 - Method of staggering reversal of thermal spray inside a cylinder bore [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.03.2005
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, Inc.
600 Parklane Towers East
Dearborn, MI 48331 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, Inc.
600 Parklane Towers East
Dearborn, Michigan 48331 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Cook, David, James
28420, Wildwood Trail
Farmington Hills, Michigan 48336 / US
02 / Baughman, James, Richard
49632, Pineridge Drive
Plymouth, Michigan 48170 / US
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Messulam, Alec Moses, et al
Harrison IP Limited
3 Ebor House
London Ebor Business Park
Millfield Lane
Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Messulam, Alec Moses, et al
A. Messulam & Co. Ltd. 43-45 High Road Bushy Heath Bushy
Hertfordshire WD23 1EE / GB
Former [2000/06]Messulam, Alec Moses, et al
A. Messulam & Co. Ltd., 24 Broadway
Leigh-on-Sea, Essex SS9 1BN / GB
Application number, filing date99305480.812.07.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateUS1998011412013.07.1998         Original published format: US 114120
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0978320
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0978320
Date:14.08.2002
[2002/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978320
Date:28.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.06.2002
ClassificationIPC:B05B7/22, C23C4/16, C23C4/12
[2002/33]
CPC:
C23C4/12 (EP,US); Y10T29/49272 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/06]B05B7/22, C23C4/16
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/19]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren mit versetztem Umkehrpunkt beim thermischen Spritzen innerhalb einer Zylinderbohrung[2000/06]
English:Method of staggering reversal of thermal spray inside a cylinder bore[2000/06]
French:Procédé avec transposition du point de rebroussement pendant le revêtement par pulvérisation pour revêtir des alésages cylindriques[2000/06]
Examination procedure28.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/14]
20.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.2004Fee for grant paid
16.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR28.04.2004
[2006/32]
Documents cited:Search[A]US5245153  (SINGER ALFRED R E [GB], et al) [A] 1,10 * column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 24; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5271967  (KRAMER MARTIN S [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * column 5, line 39 - column 7, line 17; figure - *;
 [A]EP0839924  (INGERSOLL RAND CO [US]) [A] 1,10 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 58; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5766693  (RAO V DURGA NAGESWAR [US]) [A] 1,10* column 6, line 49 - column 7, line 23; figure 6 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.