Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970789

EP0970789 - Ceramics base plate and method of producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.03.2005
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.05.2005  [2005/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0041 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/20]For all designated states
Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Natsuhara, Masuhiro
Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd.
1-1, Koyakita 1-chome, Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP
02 / Nakata, Hirohiko
Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd.
1-1, Koyakita 1-chome, Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date99305490.709.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateJP1998019572510.07.1998         Original published format: JP 19572598
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0970789
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0970789
Date:27.02.2002
[2002/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970789
Date:12.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.01.2002
ClassificationInternational:B28B11/14, B28B17/00, B28D5/00
[2002/09]
Former International [2000/02]B28B11/14, B28B17/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2002/46]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Keramische Grundplatte und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung[2000/02]
English:Ceramics base plate and method of producing the same[2000/02]
French:Plaque de céramique et méthode pour sa fabrication[2000/02]
Examination procedure27.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/23]
21.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2004Fee for grant paid
08.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]US3542266  (WOELFLE RUDOLF) [X] 1,4,8 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3;
 [Y]JPH0195006  ;
 [A]JPH091530  ;
 [A]US5175044  (ARASAWA RYU) [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890713), vol. 013, no. 305, Database accession no. (M - 849), & JP01095006 A 19890413 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 2,3 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 1997, no. 05, & JP09001530 A 19970107 (SUMITOMO KINZOKU ELECTRO DEVICE:KK) [A] 1 * abstract *