blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0972992 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0972992



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 106
25.06.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
17.08.2006 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
01.09.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.06.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
27.06.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
27.06.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
08.03.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
08.03.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
08.03.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
07.10.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
07.10.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.10.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
05.08.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
03.08.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.07.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.03.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
26.03.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.10.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
10.06.2002 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
19.04.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
19.04.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.04.2002 European search report Search / examination 1
08.12.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
12.07.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
12.07.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
12.07.1999 Description Search / examination 13
12.07.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
12.07.1999 Drawings Search / examination 4
12.07.1999 Priority document Search / examination 23
12.07.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6