blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0972992


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.06.2009 Change - representative published on  29.07.2009  [2009/31]
18.08.2006 No opposition filed within time limit published on  20.09.2006  [2006/38]
27.08.2005 (Expected) grant published on  12.10.2005  [2005/41]
10.08.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.07.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
26.07.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
28.02.2005 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.10.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
11.08.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.08.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.03.2004 First examination report
24.03.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.08.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.05.2003 Change - extension states
11.01.2003 Definitive list of designations published on  26.02.2003  [2003/09]
27.12.2002 Request for examination filed published on  05.02.2003  [2003/06]
14.08.2002 Renewal fee
19.04.2002 Publication of search report published on  05.06.2002  [2002/23]
09.08.2001 Renewal fee
03.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.01.2000 [2000/03]