blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0972992
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP3160592BGlobal Dossier 25.04.2001B2
JP2000130758 12.05.2000A
Priority number Date
US11650998 16.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0972992Global Dossier 12.10.2005B1
EP0972992 05.06.2002A3
EP0972992 19.01.2000A2
Priority number Date
US11650998 16.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69927641T 06.07.2006T2
DE69927641D 17.11.2005D1
Priority number Date
US11650998 16.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6145319 14.11.2000A
Priority number Date
US11650998 16.07.1998