Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972992

EP0972992 - Combustor liner [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.08.2006
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Burns, Craig Patrick
3611 Eagle Court
Mason, Ohio 45040 / US
02 / Thompson, James Edward
6727 Eldorado Drive
Middletown, Ohio 45044 / US
03 / Duncan, Beverly Stephenson
7113 Gregory Creek Lane
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
04 / Wiehe, Glenn Edward
7854 Harrison Avenue
Mt. Healthy, Ohio 45231 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Goode, Ian Roy , et al
London Patent Operation
General Electric International, Inc.
15 John Adam Street
London
WC2N 6LU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Goode, Ian Roy , et al
London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London
WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2000/03]Goode, Ian Roy , et al
GE LONDON PATENT OPERATION, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date99305498.012.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateUS1998011650916.07.1998         Original published format: US 116509
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972992
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972992
Date:05.06.2002
[2002/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972992
Date:12.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:F23R3/00
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/09]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Brennkammerwand[2000/03]
English:Combustor liner[2000/03]
French:Chemise de chambre de combustion[2000/03]
Examination procedure05.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/06]
26.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2005Fee for grant paid
18.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
02.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
01.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US5775108  (ANSART DENIS ROGER HENRI [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 13 * * figures 1,3-5 * * claim - *;
 [DA]US5261223  (FOLTZ HOWARD L [US]) [DA] 1-11 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 9 * * column 5, line 66 - column 7, line 46 * * figures 2-4 *;
 [DA]US5181379  (WAKEMAN THOMAS G [IN], et al) [DA] 1-11 * column 5, line 8 - line 37 * * figures 2,4,5 *;
 [A]US5233828  (NAPOLI PHILLIP D [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 4, line 50 - line 61 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US5279127  (NAPOLI PHILLIP D [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 5, line 23 - column 6, line 43 * * figures 2,5 *;
 [A]EP0592161  (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1-11 * column 4, line 2 - line 11 * * figures 2,5 * * claim - *
by applicantUS5181379
 US5261223