Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0981089

EP0981089 - Method and apparatus for providing failure detection and recovery with predetermined degree of replication for distributed applications in a network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.03.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
For all designated states
Academia Sinica
128 Sec. 2, Academic Road Nan-Kang
Taipei / TW
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
For all designated states
Academia Sinica
128 Sec. 2, Academic Road
Nan-Kang, Taipei / TW
Inventor(s)01 / Chung, Pi-Yu
15802 SE 58th Street
Bellevue, Washington 98006 / US
02 / Huang, Yennun
33 Linberger Drive
Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US
03 / Liang, Deron
Institute of Infor. SCI Academia Sinica
Taiwan 11529 / TW
04 / Shih, Chia-Yen
30 Johnston Drive
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974 / TW
05 / Yajnik, Shalini
222 Country Club Lane
Scotch Plains, New Jersey 07076 / TW
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green
Essex, IG8 0TU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr.
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date99305518.512.07.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateUS1998011914020.07.1998         Original published format: US 119140
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0981089
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0981089
Date:06.06.2001
[2001/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0981089
Date:14.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/14
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2002/09]
Former [2000/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Fehlererkennung und Wiederherstellung mit vorbestimmtem Replikationsgrad für verteilte Anwendungen in einem Netzwerk[2000/08]
English:Method and apparatus for providing failure detection and recovery with predetermined degree of replication for distributed applications in a network[2000/08]
French:Procédé et appareil pour détection de défaillance et recouvrement avec degré prédéterminé de réplication pour des applications distribuées dans un réseau[2000/08]
Examination procedure21.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/04]
22.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.03.2003Fee for grant paid
01.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT14.05.2003
NL14.05.2003
ES25.08.2003
[2008/17]
Former [2004/03]NL14.05.2003
ES25.08.2003
Former [2004/02]NL14.05.2003
Documents cited:Search[YD]US5748882  (HUANG YENNUN [US]) [YD] 1-22 * abstract * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 23 * * column 5, line 2 - column 6, line 64 * * column 8, line 26 - column 10, line 4 * * column 17, line 1 - line 20 *;
 [Y]US5408649  (BESHEARS NORMAN J [US], et al) [Y] 7,8 * column 12, line 16 - column 14, line 7; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5440726  (FUCHS WESLEY K [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *
 [Y]  CUYVERS R ET AL, "A KERNEL FOR MULTI-LEVEL FAULT-TOLERANT MULTIPROCESSING1", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SOUTHEAST CONFERENCE,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (1991), vol. -, ISBN 0-7803-0033-5, pages 248 - 252, XP000286858 [Y] 1-6,9-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SECON.1991.147747
 [Y]  MAFFEIS SILVANO, "Piranha: A CORBA tool for high availability", COMPUTER;COMPUTER APR 1997 IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (199704), vol. 30, no. 4, pages 59 - 66, XP002163562 [Y] 1-6,9-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2.585155