blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0972602

EP0972602 - Chop saw [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.09.2006
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip29.09.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.11.2006  [2006/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Black & Decker Inc.
Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway
Newark, DE 19711 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/47]For all designated states
Black & Decker Inc.
Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway
Newark, DE 19711 / US
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Black & Decker Inc.
Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway
Newark Delaware 19711 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Dibbern, John E., Jr.
3405 Grier Nursery RD
Street, Maryland 21154 / US
02 / Welsh, Robert P.
913 Farmstead Road
Hunt Valley, Maryland 21030 / US
03 / Krout, Daniel L.
2 Adam's Court
New Freedom, Pennsylvania 17349 / US
04 / Montague, Daniel H.
129 Penny Lane
New Freedom, Pennsylvania 17349 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Dlugosz, Anthony Charles, et al
Black & Decker Europe
European Group Headquarters
210 Bath Road
Slough
Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Dlugosz, Anthony Charles, et al
Black & Decker Europe European Group Headquarters 210 Bath Road
Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
Application number, filing date99305554.013.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateUS1998011525313.07.1998         Original published format: US 115253
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972602
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972602
Date:26.02.2003
[2003/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972602
Date:23.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.01.2003
ClassificationIPC:B23D45/04, B23D47/04
[2000/03]
CPC:
B23D47/00 (EP,US); B23D45/00 (KR); B23D45/042 (EP,US);
B23D47/04 (EP,US); Y10T83/7487 (EP,US); Y10T83/768 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7693 (EP,US); Y10T83/7697 (EP,US); Y10T83/7705 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7726 (EP,US); Y10T83/7872 (EP,US); Y10T83/8773 (EP,US);
Y10T83/9469 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/46]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kappsäge[2000/03]
English:Chop saw[2000/03]
French:Scie pivotante[2000/03]
Examination procedure27.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/21]
06.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2005Fee for grant paid
26.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05009537.1  / EP1586398
EP07102299.0  / EP1792681
EP08103152.8  / EP1982786
Opposition(s)24.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0579874  (HUANG KIN [TW]) [X] 3-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5720096  (DORSEY A NELSON [US]) [A] 3-7 * column W *;
 [A]EP0541051  (MAKITA CORP [JP]) [A] 3-7 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5720096
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.