Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973028

EP0973028 - Electrode array [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.07.2005
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.09.2005  [2005/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oxley Developments Company Limited
Priory Park Ulverston
Cumbria LA12 9QG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/39]For all designated states
Oxley Developments Company Limited
Priory Park
Ulverston Cumbria LA12 9QG / GB
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
OXLEY DEVELOPMENTS CO., LTD.
Priory Park
Ulverston Cumbria LA12 9QG / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Bell, Andrew John
La Sarraz, Ashmount Road
Grange-over-Sands, Cumbria LA11 6BX / GB
02 / Palmer, Simon Richard Saunch
23 High Fell side
Kendal, Cumbria LA9 4JG / GB
[2000/03]
Representative(s)WP Thompson
8th Floor
1 Mann Island
Liverpool L3 1BP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]W.P. Thompson & Co.
Coopers Building, Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Application number, filing date99305558.113.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateGB1998001530514.07.1998         Original published format: GB 9815305
GB1999000829413.04.1999         Original published format: GB 9908294
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0973028
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0973028
Date:03.01.2001
[2001/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973028
Date:22.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/403
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesGB [2001/38]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektrodenanordnung[2000/03]
English:Electrode array[2000/03]
French:Ensemble d'électrodes[2000/03]
Examination procedure03.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/35]
04.07.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
25.10.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
16.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2004Fee for grant paid
25.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.08.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[AD]GB2290617  (SIEMENS PLESSEY CONTROLS LTD) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [AD]WO9415207  (UNILEVER PLC ;UNILEVER NV (NL); BIRCH BRIAN JEFFREY (GB); MORRIS N) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [A]  - GOUVERNEUR S ET AL, "NEW DENSIFICATION PROCESS OF THICK FILMS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPONENTS,HYBRIDS,AND MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGY,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19930801), vol. 16, no. 5, ISSN 0148-6411, pages 505 - 509, XP000412729 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/33.239879