Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973070

EP0973070 - Magnetic particles and magnetic carrier for electrophotographic developer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.01.2008
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TODA KOGYO CORPORATION
1-2, Funairi-minami 4-chome, Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi
Hiroshima-ken / JP
[2007/12]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
Toda Kogyo Corporation
1-2, Funairi-minami 4-chome, Naka-ku
Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
TODA KOGYO CORP.
7-1 Yokogawa-Shinmachi Nishi-ku
Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hakata, Toshiyuki
11-30, Fujinoki 3-chome, Saeki-ku
Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Woods, Geoffrey Corlett
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Woods, Geoffrey Corlett
J.A. KEMP & CO. Gray's Inn 14 South Square
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date99305576.314.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateJP1998020319217.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20319298
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973070
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973070
Date:21.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G03G9/113, H01F1/36
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/40]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Magnetische Teilchen und magnetischer Träger für elektrophotographische Entwickler[2000/03]
English:Magnetic particles and magnetic carrier for electrophotographic developer[2000/03]
French:Particules magnétiques et agent de véhiculation magnétique pour révélateurs électrophotographiques[2000/03]
Examination procedure24.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
16.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.2006Fee for grant paid
06.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.12.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
12.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR21.03.2007
NL21.03.2007
GB14.07.2007
[2008/52]
Former [2008/24]NL21.03.2007
GB14.07.2007
FR23.11.2007
Former [2008/17]NL21.03.2007
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH06222619  ;
 [Y]JPH07104522  ;
 [Y]JPH1078681  ;
 [Y]EP0662644  (KAO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1 * claims 1-8 *;
 [Y]EP0679956  (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1 * page 4, line 37 - line 39; claims 6-8,12,13 *;
 [Y]US4841331  (NAKAYAMA NOBUHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * column 5, line 65 - line 67; examples 1-16 *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 37, Database accession no. 1994-297032, XP002121433 & JPH06222619 A 19940812 (RICOH) [Y] 1 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 25, Database accession no. 1995-188216, XP002121434 & JPH07104522 A 19950421 (POWDER TEC) [Y] 1 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 22, Database accession no. 1998-246766, XP002121435 & JPH1078681 A 19980324 (RICOH) [Y] 1 * abstract *