Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976742

EP0976742 - A synthesis of furan sulfonamide compounds useful in the synthesis of IL-1 inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.11.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfizer Products Inc.
Eastern Point Road
Groton, CT 06340 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Pfizer Products Inc.
Eastern Point Road
Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Urban, Frank John
12 Twin Lakes Drive
Waterford, Connecticut 06385 / US
02 / Jasys, Vytautas John
289 Lester Road
Griswold, Connecticut 06351 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Simpson, Alison Elizabeth Fraser , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP The Podium
1 Eversholt Street
London NW1 2DN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Simpson, Alison Elizabeth Fraser , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 91 Wimpole Street
London W1M 8AH / GB
Application number, filing date99305584.714.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateUS1998009431527.07.1998         Original published format: US 94315
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976742
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07D307/64, C07D307/68
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:Eine Synthese von Furansulfonamid-Derivaten zur Verwendung in der Herstellung von IL-1 Inhibitoren[2000/05]
English:A synthesis of furan sulfonamide compounds useful in the synthesis of IL-1 inhibitors[2000/05]
French:Un procédé de préparation de composés sulfonamide de furanne utilisés dans la synthèse d'inhibiteurs de l' IL-1[2000/05]
Examination procedure23.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
01.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/02]
16.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
17.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[PA]WO9832733  (PFIZER [US], et al) [PA] 1,10,12 * abstract * * page 41 - page 42 *
 [A]  HARTMAN, GEORGE D. ET AL, "4-Substituted thiophene- and furan-2-sulfonamides as topical carbonic anhydrase inhibitors", J. MED. CHEM. (1992), 35(21), 3822-31, XP002124736 [A] 1,10,12 * abstract * * page 1794 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00099a010
 [A]  HARTMAN, GEORGE D. ET AL, "Synthesis and derivativation of novel 4-aroylthiophene- and furan-2-sulfonamides", J. HETEROCYCL. CHEM. (1989), 26(6), 1793-8, XP002124737 [A] 1,10,12 * abstract * * page 3824 - page 3825 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570260648