blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0998132 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0998132



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 541
11.07.2007 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
10.08.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.06.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.06.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
19.06.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
19.06.2006 Translation of priority document Search / examination 127
27.02.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
27.02.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
27.02.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
27.02.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 108
17.02.2006 Invitation to file a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
15.02.2006 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
06.02.2006 Annex to a communication Search / examination 29
06.02.2006 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
06.02.2006 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
06.02.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
06.02.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
06.02.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
31.10.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
26.10.2005 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
20.10.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
20.10.2005 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
20.10.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
18.08.2005 Claims Search / examination 6
18.08.2005 Claims Search / examination 10
18.08.2005 Description Search / examination 1
18.08.2005 Description Search / examination 1
18.08.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.08.2005 Claims Search / examination 10
15.08.2005 Claims Search / examination 6
15.08.2005 Description Search / examination 1
15.08.2005 Description Search / examination 1
15.08.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.04.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
04.04.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.02.2005 Claims Search / examination 10
17.02.2005 Claims Search / examination 13
17.02.2005 Description Search / examination 1
17.02.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.02.2005 Claims Search / examination 10
15.02.2005 Claims Search / examination 13
15.02.2005 Description Search / examination 1
15.02.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.10.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
05.10.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.08.2004 General enquiry Search / examination 1
29.07.2002 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
22.07.2002 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
31.05.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
31.05.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
31.05.2002 European search report Search / examination 1
22.03.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
14.07.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.07.1999 Claims Search / examination 12
14.07.1999 Description Search / examination 85
14.07.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.07.1999 Drawings Search / examination 19
14.07.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6