blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0998132


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.07.2007 No opposition filed within time limit published on  15.08.2007  [2007/33]
04.08.2006 (Expected) grant published on  06.09.2006  [2006/36]
03.08.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.06.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
29.06.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
14.02.2006 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.02.2006 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.10.2005 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
24.08.2005 New entry: Reply to examination report
05.08.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.03.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.02.2005 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.10.2004 First examination report
29.09.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.08.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.08.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.06.2003 Change - extension states
21.02.2003 Definitive list of designations published on  09.04.2003  [2003/15]
30.08.2002 Request for examination filed published on  16.10.2002  [2002/42]
13.08.2002 Renewal fee
31.05.2002 Publication of search report published on  17.07.2002  [2002/29]
02.08.2001 Renewal fee
17.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.05.2000 [2000/18]