blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0998132
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7167277Global Dossier 23.01.2007B2
US2004061881 01.04.2004A1
Priority number Date
US33676699 21.06.1999
JP30441898 26.10.1998
US60264203 25.06.2003
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP3960694BGlobal Dossier 15.08.2007B2
JP2000134490 12.05.2000A
Priority number Date
JP30441898 26.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0998132Global Dossier 06.09.2006B1
EP0998132 17.07.2002A3
EP0998132 03.05.2000A2
Priority number Date
JP30441898 26.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69933100T 15.02.2007T2
DE69933100D 19.10.2006D1
Priority number Date
JP30441898 26.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6611356 26.08.2003B1
Priority number Date
JP30441898 26.10.1998