Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0998132

EP0998132 - Color data conversion [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.07.2007
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.08.2007  [2007/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/36]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shimizu, Masayoshi, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
02 / Mori, Masahiro, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
03 / Suzuki, Shoji, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
04 / Semba, Satoshi, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Stebbing, Timothy Charles , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]Stebbing, Timothy Charles , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date99305591.214.07.1999
[2000/18]
Priority number, dateJP1998030441826.10.1998         Original published format: JP 30441898
[2000/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0998132
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0998132
Date:17.07.2002
[2002/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0998132
Date:06.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/60
[2000/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/15]
Former [2000/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Farbdatenumwandlung[2000/18]
English:Color data conversion[2000/18]
French:Conversion des données de couleur[2000/18]
Examination procedure14.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/42]
05.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2006Date of oral proceedings
15.02.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
27.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.06.2006Fee for grant paid
21.06.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.06.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
26.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0961488  (SONY CORP [JP]) [E] 1 * figure 19 *;
 [A]US5724443  (NISHIKAWA YOSHIAKI [JP]);
 [A]US5712925  (OHGA MANABU [JP]);
 [A]US5583666  (ELLSON RICHARD N [US], et al);
 [A]US5699491  (BARZEL RON [US])
 [X]  MOROVIC J; LUO R, "A Universal Algorithm for Colour Gamut Mapping", COLOUR IMAGING MULTIMEDIA CONFERENCE, Derby, UK, (19980327), URL: http://colour.derby.ac.uk/jan/morCIM98.pdf, (20020327), XP002194635 [X] 1 * Section 4.1, Figure 8 *
 [A]  GENTILE R S ET AL, "A COMPARISON OF TECHNIQUES FOR COLOR GAMUT MISMATCH COMPENSATION", JOURNAL OF IMAGING TECHNOLOGY, SOC. FOR IMAGING SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, SPRINGFIELD, VA, US, (19901001), vol. 16, no. 5, pages 176 - 181, XP000167934