Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975155

EP0975155 - Imaging apparatus and recording/reproducing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.06.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.07.2018  [2018/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takezawa, Masayuki
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Mizutani, Yoichi
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Matsumoto, Hideki
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Nakajima, Ken
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
05 / Yamamoto, Toshihisa
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Postfach 10 18 30
40009 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/41]Schüll, Gottfried Hubert , et al
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2000/04]Turner, James Arthur , et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date99305638.115.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateJP1998020408817.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20408898
JP1998033161420.11.1998         Original published format: JP 33161498
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0975155
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0975155
Date:05.12.2001
[2001/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/335
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/35]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bilderzeugungsapparat und Aufzeichnungs-/Wiedergabegerät[2000/04]
English:Imaging apparatus and recording/reproducing apparatus[2000/04]
French:Appareil de prise d'images et appareil d'enregistrement/reproduction[2000/04]
Examination procedure08.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/28]
19.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/27]
28.02.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/27]
Divisional application(s)EP09015936.9  / EP2164245
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.03.2008
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
08.08.2013Request for further processing filed
08.08.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.08.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
12.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
13.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
10.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
27.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
10.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
14.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 16
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 17
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 18
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201719   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5734427  (HAYASHI KENKICHI) [A] 1,5,11 * column 4, line 8 - line 22 *;
 [A]WO9724880  (INTEL CORP) [A] 1,5,11 * page 5, line 8 - line 13 * * page 4, line 21 - line 23 *