blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0979878

EP0979878 - Method for detecting oligonucleotides and determining base sequence of nucleic acids [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.12.2006
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.01.2007  [2007/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE INSTITUTE OF PHYSICAL & CHEMICAL RESEARCH
2-1, Hirosawa Wako-shi
Saitama-ken / JP
For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Dnaform
3-35 Mita 1-chome Minato-Ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/31]For all designated states
THE INSTITUTE OF PHYSICAL & CHEMICAL RESEARCH
2-1, Hirosawa
Wako-shi Saitama-ken / JP
For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Dnaform
3-35 Mita 1-chome Minato-Ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
THE INSTITUTE OF PHYSICAL & CHEMICAL RESEARCH
2-1, Hirosawa
Wako-shi Saitama-ken / JP
For all designated states
Hayashizaki, Yoshihide
22-1-201, Inarimae
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0061 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hayashizaki, Yoshihide
22-1-201, Inarimae
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Thomas, Philip John Duval
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Thomas, Philip John Duval
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date99305648.016.07.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateJP1998020361917.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20361998
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0979878
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0979878
Date:22.03.2000
[2000/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2000
ClassificationIPC:C12Q1/68, B01D57/02, G01N21/64, G01N27/447
[2000/07]
CPC:
G01N27/44721 (EP,US); C12Q1/6869 (EP,US); Y10S436/80 (EP,US)
C-Set:
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2565/125, C12Q2565/102, C12Q2537/143 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2003/05]
Former [2000/49]CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  NL,  SE 
Former [2000/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Nachweis von Oligonukleotiden und Bestimmung der Basensequenz von Nukleinsäuren[2000/07]
English:Method for detecting oligonucleotides and determining base sequence of nucleic acids[2000/07]
French:Procédé pour détecter des oligonucléotides et détermination de la séquence des bases d'acides nucléiques[2000/07]
Examination procedure18.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
07.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.01.2005Date of oral proceedings
11.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
08.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/02]
31.07.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2007/02]
Divisional application(s)EP05075875.4  / EP1568785
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200608   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0284660  (SHIMADZU CORP [JP]) [A] 11-15;
 [A]EP0731173  (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE])[A] 1,11;
 [A]US5763175  (BRENNER SYDNEY [GB]) [A] 1;
 [A]  XP002900746 [A] 1,2,4-7,9-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.2443975
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.