Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973350

EP0973350 - Method and apparatus for providing access control to local services of mobile devices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  12.08.2005
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2009Change - representativepublished on 20.01.2010  [2010/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Phone.Com Inc.
800 Chesapeake Drive
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Phone.Com, Inc.
800 Chesapeake Drive
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Liao, Hanqing
1025 Vista Pointe Circle
San Ramon, CA 94583 / US
02 / King, F.Peter
121 Presidio Avenue
Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US
03 / Martin Jr., Bruce K.
604 Wellsbury Court
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Ablett, Graham Keith , et al
Ablett & Stebbing
7-8 Market Place
London, W1W 8AG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/03]Ablett, Graham Keith , et al
Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street
London, W1U 6FQ / GB
Former [2000/03]Ablett, Graham Keith , et al
Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street
London W1M 1FD / GB
Application number, filing date99305667.016.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateUS1998011864017.07.1998         Original published format: US 118640
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0973350
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0973350
Date:19.04.2000
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38, H04Q7/32
[2000/16]
Former International [2000/03]H04Q7/38
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Zugangskontrolle von lokalen Diensten mobiler Geräte[2000/03]
English:Method and apparatus for providing access control to local services of mobile devices[2000/03]
French:Méthode et appareil permettant contrôle d'accès à services locales d'appareils mobiles[2000/03]
Examination procedure18.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
26.10.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/39]
10.08.2005Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.10.2005
10.08.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
10.10.2005Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Request for further processing for:27.02.2004Request for further processing filed
27.02.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.03.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
16.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
08.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
09.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0562890  (HUTCHISON MICROTEL LIMITED [GB]) [X] 1,5,15 * column 1, line 42 - line 56 * * column 3, line 37 - line 50 * * column 4, line 30 - line 51 * * column 6, line 10 - line 53 *;
 [A]US5673317  (COOPER GERSHON N [US]) [A] 1,7,15 * column 2, line 1 - line 64 *;
 [A]WO9719395  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,7,15 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 10 * * page 9, line 11 - line 15 *;
 [A]WO9013213  (BLICK COMMUNICATIONS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,7,15 * page 1, line 19 - page 2, line 25 * * page 12, line 4 - line 18 *