Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972794

EP0972794 - Aqueous dispersion and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/03]Aqueous dispersion, its production method, and its use
[2011/44]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  13.01.2012
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2014Deletion: Date of receipt of notice of appeal 
02.08.2014Deletion: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsui Chemicals, Inc.
5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-Chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/49]For all designated states
MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC.
5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-Chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC.
2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tokita, Suguru
Mitsui Chemicals, Inc.
1-2,Waki-6chome
Waki-cho
Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi-ken / JP
 [2012/07]
Former [2004/14]01 / Tokita, Suguru
Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 1-2,Waki-6chome, Waki-cho
Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi-ken / JP
Former [2000/03]01 / Tokita, Suguru
Mitsui Chemical, Inc., 1-2, Waki 6-chome, Waki-cho
Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi-ken / JP
Representative(s)Benson, John Everett , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/26]Benson, John Everett , et al
J. A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2008/29]Cresswell, Thomas Anthony
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2000/03]Cresswell, Thomas Anthony
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date99305678.716.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateJP1998020183916.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20183998
JP1998020401317.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20401398
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972794
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972794
Date:21.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/17]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0972794
Date:15.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08K5/098, C08L23/08
[2011/44]
Former International [2000/03]C08K5/098, C08L23/08, B41M5/38, C08J3/03
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/40]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wässrige Dispersion und ihre Anwendung[2011/44]
English:Aqueous dispersion and its use[2011/44]
French:Dispersion aqueuse et son utilisation[2011/44]
Former [2000/03]Wässrige Dispersion, ihr Herstellungsverfahren und ihre Anwendung
Former [2000/03]Aqueous dispersion, its production method, and its use
Former [2000/03]Dispersion aqueuse, son procédé de préparation et son utilisation
Examination procedure08.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
22.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
30.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.01.2004Fee for grant paid
19.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.01.2005  28.01.2005  ADMISSIBLE
THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY
2030 Dow Center
Midland, Michigan 48674 / US
Opponent's representative
Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2005/27]
Opponent(s)01  21.01.2005  28.01.2005  ADMISSIBLE
The Dow Chemical Company
2030 Dow Center
Midland, Michigan 48674 / US
Opponent's representative
Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd
Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2005/11]
Opponent(s)01  21.01.2005  28.01.2005  ADMISSIBLE
The Dow Chemical Company
2030 Dow Center
Midland, Michigan 48674 / US
Opponent's representative
de Jong, Nicolaas Henricus Maria
Dow Benelux B.V. Patent Department Herbert H. Dowweg 5
4542 NM Hoek / NL
25.02.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.09.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.11.2010Date of oral proceedings
24.03.2011Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.03.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.08.2011Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.09.2011Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
05.01.2012Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition02.06.2011Appeal received No.  T1233/11
29.07.2011Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0381169  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,9,10 * page 2, line 52 - line 55 *;
 [A]EP0246729  (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1,6 * example -; claim - *;
 [AD]EP0173456  (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [AD] 1,8,9 * example - *;
 [A]US5317002  (ONISHI HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1,7,9 * column 8, line 32 - line 33; claims 1,5 *
OppositionJPH09202861
 US4148768
 US4775713
 EP0744439
 JPS60176037
 US3312564
 DE10109992
    - The Merck Index, vol. 11, pages 86 - 89,
    - LEROY MCMASTER, J. Am. Chem. Soc.,, vol. 36(9), pages 1916 - 1925,
    - ROBERT B. FISCHE; DENNIS G. PETERS, Basic Theory and Practice of Quantitative Chemical Analysis, vol. 3RD ED., pages 269 - 270,