blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0974975 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0974975



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 134
26.06.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
04.09.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
02.02.2007 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.02.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.12.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.12.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
15.12.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
21.10.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
10.10.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
10.10.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
10.10.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 17
15.07.2005 Claims Search / examination 1
15.07.2005 Description Search / examination 2
15.07.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.07.2005 Claims Search / examination 1
13.07.2005 Description Search / examination 2
13.07.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.03.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
08.03.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.09.2004 Description Search / examination 1
10.09.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.09.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.08.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
20.08.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.06.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
28.06.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
23.06.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
18.02.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
18.02.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.01.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
16.01.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.01.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
05.09.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
05.09.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.07.2002 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.07.2002 General enquiry Search / examination 1
11.06.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.05.2002 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
15.03.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
08.02.2001 Request for change of name Search / examination 5
01.02.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
15.12.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
22.11.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
22.11.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.11.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
20.07.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.07.1999 Claims Search / examination 3
20.07.1999 Description Search / examination 10
20.07.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.07.1999 Drawings Search / examination 6
20.07.1999 Priority document Search / examination 24
20.07.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6