blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0974975


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.09.2008 Change - representative published on  08.10.2008  [2008/41]
30.03.2007 No opposition filed within time limit published on  02.05.2007  [2007/18]
10.02.2006 (Expected) grant published on  29.03.2006  [2006/13]
22.12.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
22.12.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
06.10.2005 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.07.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.07.2005 New entry: Reply to examination report
28.05.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.05.2005 Deletion: Reply to examination report
13.09.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
17.08.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.07.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.07.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
14.02.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.02.2004 Deletion: Reply to examination report
24.01.2004 Deletion: Reply to examination report
24.01.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
05.09.2003 First examination report
03.09.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.08.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.07.2002 Renewal fee
07.06.2002 Change - representative published on  24.07.2002  [2002/30]
02.08.2001 Renewal fee
17.03.2001 Change - applicant published on  02.05.2001 [2001/18]
16.10.2000 Change - extension states
25.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  11.10.2000 [2000/41]
14.07.2000 Request for examination filed published on  30.08.2000 [2000/35]
11.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]