blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0974975
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2000066771Global Dossier 03.03.2000A
Priority number Date
US12174598 23.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0974975Global Dossier 29.03.2006B1
EP0974975 26.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
US12174598 23.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69930589T 21.12.2006T2
DE69930589D 18.05.2006D1
Priority number Date
US12174598 23.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6847367 25.01.2005B1
Priority number Date
US12174598 23.07.1998