Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974975

EP0974975 - Display for port area of electronic equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/13]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / von Alten, Thomas W.
2824 Grandee
Boise, ID 83704 / US
02 / Hoerger, Carl R.
1610 N. 24th
Boise, ID 83702 / US
03 / McAllister, Jeffrey S.
11536 Wildrose Court
Boise, ID 83713 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Carpmaels & Ransford
One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2002/30]Carpmaels & Ransford
43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2000/04]Colgan, Stephen James , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date99305726.420.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateUS1998012174523.07.1998         Original published format: US 121745
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974975
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974975
Date:29.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G11B33/10
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/41]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Anzeige für einen Öffnungsbereich eines elektronischen Geräts[2000/04]
English:Display for port area of electronic equipment[2000/04]
French:Visualisation d'une plage d'ouverture d'un équipement électronique[2000/04]
Examination procedure05.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
05.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.2005Fee for grant paid
15.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5430612  (SIMON ERNST-ULRICH [DE], et al) [X] 1,9 * column 7, line 26 - column 10, line 50 * [A] 2-8,10;
 [XA]EP0505938  (TAPPERT KARL HEINZ [DE]) [X] 1,9 * column 5, line 32 - column 8, line 49 * [A] 2-8,10;
 [A]US4514920  (SHAFRIR DORON [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 3, line 15 - column 6, line 8 *;
 [A]US5351176  (SMITH STEPHEN W [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 2, line 53 - column 6, line 15 *