Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974863

EP0974863 - Image projection system for dome surface [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushikigaisya Goto Kogaku Kenkyujyo
4-16, Yazaki-Cho Fucyu-Shi
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Kabushikigaisya Goto Kogaku Kenkyujyo
4-16, Yazaki-Cho
Fucyu-Shi, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kasahara, Makoto
976 Ogasawara, Kushigata-Cho
Nakakoma-Gun, Yamanashi-Ken / JP
02 / Ota, Hiromitsu
5-10-1, Koremasa
Fuchu-Shi, Tokyo / JP
03 / Omori, Mitsugu
968-1 Ogasawara, Kushigata-Cho
Nakakoma-Gun, Yamanashi-Ken / JP
04 / In, Hiroaki
4308-1 Nishiyawata, Ryuo-Cho
Nakakoma-Gun, Yamanashi-Ken / JP
05 / Miyazaki, Hidehiko
6-12-2, Koremasa
Fuchu-Shi, Tokyo / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Godwin, Edgar James
Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Godwin, Edgar James
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date99305737.120.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateJP1998022247923.07.1998         Original published format: JP 22247998
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974863
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974863
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G03B37/06
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/41]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kuppelprojektionssystem[2000/04]
English:Image projection system for dome surface[2000/04]
French:Système de projection d'images sur un dôme[2000/04]
Examination procedure27.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/26]
18.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2002Fee for grant paid
01.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE25.09.2002
FR25.09.2002
IT25.09.2002
[2008/17]
Former [2006/14]BE25.09.2002
FR25.09.2002
Former [2003/48]BE25.09.2002
Documents cited:Search[DA]US5136675  (HODSON JAMES M [US]) [DA] 1-9 * figures 1,2; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]JPH10339914  ;
 [DA]JPH0888822  ;
 [A]JPH04368987  ;
 [DA]JPH0388586
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, [A] 1-9 * abstract *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 1996, no. 08, [DA] 1-9 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 07, [A] 1-9 * abstract *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910705), vol. 015, no. 265, Database accession no. (E - 1086), [DA] 1-9 * abstract *