Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975153

EP0975153 - Imaging apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.12.2004
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.12.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.01.2005  [2005/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/37]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Toyoda, Keiji
118 Ooyama-cho
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken 431-1102 / JP
02 / Sano, Toshiyuki
5-13-10 Tsunashima Nishi, Kohoku-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 223-0053 / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Senior, Alan Murray , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/37]Senior, Alan Murray , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2000/04]Senior, Alan Murray
J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date99305738.920.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateJP1998021009724.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21009798
JP1999014239221.05.1999         Original published format: JP 14239299
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975153
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975153
Date:04.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/235
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/41]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bildaufnahmegerät[2000/04]
English:Imaging apparatus[2000/04]
French:Appareil de prise de vues[2000/04]
Examination procedure11.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
05.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.11.2003Fee for grant paid
25.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5204741  (SAKAGUCHI TAKASHI) [Y] 1,2,4,6-8,10 * column 4, line 32 - column 9 *;
 [Y]EP0411318  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * page 6, line 49 - page 19, line 39 *;
 [Y]EP0488442  (PHILIPS NV) [Y] 5,7,9,10 * column 3, line 27 - column 10, line 13 *;
 [A]EP0513976  (SHARP KK) [A] 1-10 * page 6, line 57 - page 7, line 40 *;
 [A]EP0774865  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-10 * column 6, line 43 - column 29, line 15 *;
 [A]EP0644687  (CANON KK) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 35 - column 34, line 37 *