Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974601

EP0974601 - Olefin polymerization catalyst and process for producing olefin polymer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.09.2004  [2004/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Japan Polychem Corporation
1-10-1 Yuraku-cho, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo-To / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Japan Polychem Corporation
1-10-1 Yuraku-cho, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo-To / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hirakawa, Katsumi
c/o Japan Polychem Corp., 1, Toho-cho
Yokkaichi-shi, Mie-ken / JP
02 / Uehara, Yumito
Mitsubishi Chemical Corp., 5-2 Marunouchi, 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo-to / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Kyle, Diana
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Kyle, Diana
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date99305780.121.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateJP1998020503221.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20503298
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974601
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974601
Date:17.05.2000
[2000/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974601
Date:10.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08F4/02, C08F4/658, C08F10/00
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2001/05]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Olefinpolymerisationskatalysator und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Olefinpolymeren[2000/04]
English:Olefin polymerization catalyst and process for producing olefin polymer[2000/04]
French:Catalyseur de polymérisation d'oléfines et procédé de préparation de polymères d'oléfines[2000/04]
Examination procedure21.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
21.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2003Fee for grant paid
30.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL10.09.2003
[2004/13]
Documents cited:SearchJPH06136049  [ ] (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND);
 JPH10182737  [ ] (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP);
 JPH06136046  [ ] (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND)
 [A]  - SUGA, SADANORI ET AL, "Olefin polymn. catalysts and manuf. of olefin polymers with wide narrow mol. wt. distribution and good moldability using the same", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19941226), vol. 121, no. 26, Database accession no. 301586, XP002133456 [A] 1-10 * abstract *
 [A]  - ISOBU, EIJI ET AL, "Multistage polymerization of olefins for polymers with good mechanical strength and blow moldability", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19980921), vol. 129, no. 12, Database accession no. 149380, XP002133457 [A] 1-10 * abstract *
 [DA]  - SUGA, SADANORI ET AL, "Olefin polymerization catalysts and manufacture of olefin polymers with wide molecular weight distribution and good moldability using the same", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19941212), vol. 121, no. 24, Database accession no. 281437, XP002133458 [DA] 1-10 * abstract *