Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974571

EP0974571 - Preparation of 1,1,1,3-tetrafluoropropene( 1234ze ) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.02.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.04.2004  [2004/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ATOFINA CHEMICALS, INC.
2000 Market Street Philadelphia
PA 19102-3222 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/50]For all designated states
ATOFINA CHEMICALS, INC.
2000 Market Street
Philadelphia PA 19102-3222 / US
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC.
2000 Market Street
Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19103-3222 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Elsheikh, Maher Yousef
784 N. Wayne Avenue
Wayne, Pennsylvania 19087 / US
02 / Fellenger, Paul David
6054 Fisher Drive
Narvon, Pennsylvania 17555 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Stoner, Gerard Patrick , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Stoner, Gerard Patrick , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date99305781.921.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateUS1998011956021.07.1998         Original published format: US 119560
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974571
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974571
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974571
Date:23.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07C17/25
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2003/10]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Herstellung von 1,1,1,3-Tetrafluorpropen (1234ze)[2000/04]
English:Preparation of 1,1,1,3-tetrafluoropropene( 1234ze )[2000/04]
French:Préparation du 1,1,1,3-tétrafluoropropène (1234ze)[2000/04]
Examination procedure04.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/26]
28.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
04.10.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
29.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.01.2003Fee for grant paid
20.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US3579595  (REGAN BERNARD M) [A] 1-3;
 [A]US3499048  (REGAN BERNARD M) [A] 1-3;
 [X]WO9605157  (ICI PLC ;POWELL RICHARD LLEWELLYN (GB); SHARRATT ANDREW PAUL (GB)) [X] 1,4,5 * example 6; claim 6 *;
 [X]EP0234002  (PENNWALT CORP) [X] 1,4,5 * claim 1 *;
 [X]WO9641679  (DU PONT ;CHRISTOPH FRANK J (US); COULSTON GEORGE W (US); RAO VELLI) [X] 1,4,5 * page 5, line 1 - line 12; examples 1-5,7-9 *;
 [X]JPS54130507  ;
 [DA]EP0486333  (ATOCHEM ELF SA) [DA] 1,4,6;
 [PX]WO9833756  (DU PONT ;NAPPA MARIO JOSEPH (US); RAO V N MALLIKARJUNA (US); SIEVE) [PX] 1,4,5 * example 1; claim 9 *
 [X]  - KNUNYANTS I L ET AL, "REACTIONS OF FLUORO OLEFINS. COMMUNICATION 13. CATALYTIC HYDROGENATION OF PERFLUORO OLEFINS", BULLETIN OF THE ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE USSR, DIVISION OF CHEMICAL SCIENCES, (19600101), ISSN 0568-5230, pages 1312 - 1317, XP000578879 [X] 1-3 * See p. 1313, reaction (XI) -> (XIII) and p. 1316, sixth paragraph. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00907661
 [A]  - DEPUY, C.H. & SCHULTZ, A.L., "Electronic Effects in Elimination reactions. VIII. E2 Reaction of 2-Arylethyl Fluorides", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (19740405), vol. 39, no. 7, pages 878 - 881, XP002118546 [A] 1-3

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00921a004
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19791214), vol. 003, no. 152, Database accession no. (C - 067), & JP54130507 A 19791009 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [X] 1,4,5 * abstract *