blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0980987

EP0980987 - Constant velocity flexible coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.08.2006
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2010Change - representativepublished on 25.08.2010  [2010/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MSI, Inc
703 South Marion Road Sioux Falls
South Dakota / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
MSI, Inc
703 South Marion Road
Sioux Falls, South Dakota / US
Inventor(s)01 / Giere, David W.
c/o Giere Company 35 NW 2nd Street Suite 102
Ortonville MN 56278 / US
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Wilson Gunn
Charles House
148/9 Great Charles Street
Birmingham B3 3HT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/34]Wilson Gunn
Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham
B3 3HT / GB
Former [2005/32]Hill, Richard, et al
Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street
Birmingham B3 3HT / GB
Former [2004/23]Hill, Richard, et al
R.E. Parr & Co., Charles House, 148/9 Great Charles Street
Birmingham B3 3HT / GB
Former [2004/20]Hill, Richard
Wilson Gunn Skerrett, Charles House, 148/9 Great Charles Street
Birmingham B3 3HT / GB
Former [2000/08]Parr, Ronald Edward
R.E. Parr & Co., Colman House, Station Road
Knowle, Solihull, West Midlands B93 0HL / GB
Application number, filing date99305802.322.07.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateUS1998012310427.07.1998         Original published format: US 123104
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0980987
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0980987
Date:22.08.2001
[2001/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.07.2001
ClassificationIPC:F16D3/78, B62D7/06
[2001/34]
CPC:
F16D3/76 (EP,US); F16D3/52 (EP,US); F16D3/60 (EP,US);
F16D3/72 (EP,US); F16D3/74 (EP,US); F16D3/78 (EP,US);
F16D3/79 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2000/08]F16D3/78
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/41]
Former [2002/33]DE,  FR,  GB,  IT 
Former [2002/21](deleted) 
Former [2000/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elastisches Gleichlaufgelenk[2000/08]
English:Constant velocity flexible coupling[2000/08]
French:Joint homocinétique flexible[2000/08]
Examination procedure14.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/33]
05.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
16.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/36]
21.04.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
05.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
15.05.2002AT   M01   Fee paid on   14.06.2002
15.05.2002BE   M01   Fee paid on   14.06.2002
15.05.2002CH   M01   Fee paid on   14.06.2002
15.05.2002CY   M01   Fee paid on   14.06.2002
15.05.2002DE   M01   Fee paid on   14.06.2002
15.05.2002DK   M01   Fee paid on   14.06.2002
15.05.2002ES   M01   Fee paid on   14.06.2002
15.05.2002FI   M01   Fee paid on   14.06.2002
15.05.2002FR   M01   Fee paid on   14.06.2002
15.05.2002GB   M01   Fee paid on   14.06.2002
15.05.2002GR   M01   Fee paid on   14.06.2002
15.05.2002IE   M01   Fee paid on   14.06.2002
15.05.2002IT   M01   Fee paid on   14.06.2002
15.05.2002LU   M01   Fee paid on   14.06.2002
15.05.2002MC   M01   Fee paid on   14.06.2002
15.05.2002NL   M01   Fee paid on   14.06.2002
15.05.2002PT   M01   Fee paid on   14.06.2002
15.05.2002SE   M01   Fee paid on   14.06.2002
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
15.05.2002M01   Fee paid on   14.06.2002
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200305   M06   Fee paid on   02.02.2004
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[E]US5951400  (GIERE DAVID W [US]) [E] 1-3 * abstract * * column 6, line 33 - line 44; figure 9 * * column 7, line 13 - line 26; figure 12 *;
 [Y]EP0636805  (K SEVEN KK [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * column 10, line 47 - line 57 *;
 [Y]EP0285063  (BRUSEGHINI ERIO & C BRA [IT]) [Y] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [YA]US5221232  (NAMENY FRANK J [US]) [Y] 1,2 * column A; figures 5,8 * [A] 3;
 [Y]US4385677  (SOWERS EUGENE E) [Y] 1,2 * column A; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2182711  (THOMAS BERTHA E) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-7 *;
 [A]JPH08232974
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970131), vol. 1997, no. 01, & JP08232974 A 19960910 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD) [A] 3 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.