Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975199

EP0975199 - UBR traffic class for ATM with and without weighted priorities [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.09.2011
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 19.06.2013  [2013/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ericsson AB
Torshamnsgatan 23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[2010/19]
Former [2007/02]For all designated states
Ericsson AB
Torshamnsgaten 23
Stockholm / SE
Former [2006/36]For all designated states
Ericsson AB
Torshamnsgaten 23
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Former [2003/42]For all designated states
Marconi Intellectual Property (Ringfence) Inc.
3000 Marconi Drive
Warrendale, Pennsylvania 15086 / US
Former [2001/36]For all designated states
Marconi Communications, Inc.
1000 Fore Drive
Warrendale, Pennsylvania 15086 / US
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Fore Systems, Inc.
1000 Fore Drive
Warrendale, Pennsylvania 15086 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Hyong S.
625 Glengary Drive
Pittsburgh, PA 15215 / US
02 / Sansom, Robert D.
105 Fairway Lane
Pittsburgh, PA 15238 / US
03 / Cleeton, Lawrence R.
741 Bull Creek Road
Butler, PA 16002 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Litchfield, Laura Marie , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Litchfield, Laura Marie , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date99305824.722.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateUS19980094055P24.07.1998         Original published format: US 94055 P
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0975199
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0975199
Date:13.04.2005
[2005/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975199
Date:10.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.2005
ClassificationInternational:H04Q11/04, H04L12/56
[2005/15]
Former International [2000/04]H04Q11/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:UBR Verkehrsklasse für ATM mit und ohne gewichteten Prioritäten[2000/04]
English:UBR traffic class for ATM with and without weighted priorities[2000/04]
French:Classe de trafic UBR pour ATM avec et sans priorités pondérées[2000/04]
Examination procedure19.09.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.10.2005Examination requested  [2005/49]
16.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2010Fee for grant paid
27.09.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.08.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
26.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
30.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
28.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
26.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.11.2010
BE10.11.2010
CY10.11.2010
DK10.11.2010
FI10.11.2010
NL10.11.2010
SE10.11.2010
GR11.02.2011
ES21.02.2011
PT10.03.2011
IE22.07.2011
LU22.07.2011
CH31.07.2011
LI31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
FR01.08.2011
[2013/25]
Former [2012/35]AT10.11.2010
BE10.11.2010
CY10.11.2010
DK10.11.2010
FI10.11.2010
NL10.11.2010
SE10.11.2010
GR11.02.2011
ES21.02.2011
PT10.03.2011
IE22.07.2011
CH31.07.2011
LI31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
FR01.08.2011
Former [2012/22]AT10.11.2010
BE10.11.2010
CY10.11.2010
DK10.11.2010
FI10.11.2010
NL10.11.2010
SE10.11.2010
GR11.02.2011
ES21.02.2011
PT10.03.2011
CH31.07.2011
LI31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
FR01.08.2011
Former [2012/20]AT10.11.2010
BE10.11.2010
CY10.11.2010
DK10.11.2010
FI10.11.2010
NL10.11.2010
SE10.11.2010
GR11.02.2011
ES21.02.2011
PT10.03.2011
CH31.07.2011
LI31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
Former [2012/11]AT10.11.2010
BE10.11.2010
CY10.11.2010
DK10.11.2010
FI10.11.2010
NL10.11.2010
SE10.11.2010
GR11.02.2011
ES21.02.2011
PT10.03.2011
MC31.07.2011
Former [2011/40]AT10.11.2010
BE10.11.2010
CY10.11.2010
DK10.11.2010
FI10.11.2010
NL10.11.2010
SE10.11.2010
GR11.02.2011
ES21.02.2011
PT10.03.2011
Former [2011/35]AT10.11.2010
BE10.11.2010
CY10.11.2010
FI10.11.2010
NL10.11.2010
SE10.11.2010
GR11.02.2011
ES21.02.2011
PT10.03.2011
Former [2011/29]AT10.11.2010
CY10.11.2010
FI10.11.2010
NL10.11.2010
SE10.11.2010
GR11.02.2011
PT10.03.2011
Documents cited:Search[Y]  KAI-YEUNG SIU ET AL, "Virtual queueing techniques for UBR+ service in ATM with fair access and minimum bandwidth guarantee", GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 1997. GLOBECOM '97., IEEE PHOENIX, AZ, USA 3-8 NOV. 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19971103), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-4198-8, pages 1081 - 1085, XP010254767 [Y] 1-24 * abstract * * page 1081, column 2, line 21 - line 27 * * page 1082, column 1, paragraph III * * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.1997.638493
 [Y]  SHINOHARA M ET AL, "MULTICLASS LARGE SCALE ATM SWITCH WITH QOS GUARANTEE", 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS. MONTREAL, JUNE 8, (19970608), VOL. 1, ISBN 0-7803-3926-6, pages 453 - 461, XP000740279 [Y] 1-24 * figures 1,2 * * page 453, paragraph 2 * * page 454, paragraph 3 - page 456 *
 [A]  SUNG WON LEE ET AL, "Improved dynamic weighted cell scheduling algorithm based on earliest deadline first scheme for various traffics of ATM switch", GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 1996. GLOBECOM '96. 'COMMUNICATIONS: THE KEY TO GLOBAL PROSPERITY LONDON, UK 18-22 NOV. 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19961118), vol. 3, ISBN 0-7803-3336-5, pages 1959 - 1963, XP010220219 [A] 1,3,12,18 * the whole document *