Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976999

EP0976999 - Heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  24.06.2011
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.06.2011Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 27.07.2011  [2011/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sanden Corporation
20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi
Gunma 372-8502 / JP
[2011/30]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Sanden Corporation
20 Kotobuki-cho
Isesaki-shi, Gunma 372-8502 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hosoya, Kazuki
c/o Sanden Corporation, 20 Kotobuki-cho
Isesaki-shi, Gunma 372-8502 / JP
02 / Sakano, Akira
c/o Sanden Corporation, 20 Kotobuki-cho
Isesaki-shi, Gunma 372-8502 / JP
03 / Shinmura, Toshiharu
c/o Sanden Corporation, 20 Kotobuki-cho
Isesaki-shi, Gunma 372-8502 / JP
04 / Kado, Hirotaka
c/o Sanden Corporation, 20 Kotobuki-cho
Isesaki-shi, Gunma 372-8502 / JP
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date99305830.422.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateJP1998021699931.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21699998
JP1998021996804.08.1998         Original published format: JP 21996898
JP1999019295007.07.1999         Original published format: JP 19295099
JP1999019301807.07.1999         Original published format: JP 19301899
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0976999
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0976999
Date:13.09.2000
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976999
Date:10.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/37]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0976999
Date:27.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:F28D1/053, F28F3/02
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/22]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wärmetauscher[2000/05]
English:Heat exchanger[2000/05]
French:Echangeur de chaleur[2000/05]
Examination procedure06.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
28.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.05.2003Fee for grant paid
02.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02022284.0  / EP1271084
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.06.2004  09.09.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Autokühler GmbH & Co. KG
Hohler Weg 31
34369 Hofgeismar / DE
Opponent's representative
Specht, Peter
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2010/25]
Opponent(s)01  09.06.2004  09.09.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Autokühler GmbH & Co. KG
Hohler Weg 31
34369 Hofgeismar / DE
Opponent's representative
Specht, Peter
Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Former [2004/32]
Opponent(s)01  09.06.2004   
Autokühler GmbH & Co. KG
Hohler Weg 31
34369 Hofgeismar / DE
Opponent's representative
Freiherr von Schorlemer, Reinfried, Dipl.-Phys.
Karthäuser Strasse 5A
34117 Kassel / DE
09.09.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.01.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.01.2005Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
18.07.2005Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
09.09.2010Date of oral proceedings
17.11.2010Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.11.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.11.2010Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.03.2011Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
08.06.2011Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2256471  (CALSONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,26 * page 9, paragraph L - page 14, paragraph 1; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]WO9423449  (LEE YONG NAK [US]) [A] 1,26 * page 14, paragraph 2 - page 16, line 22; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US4502315  (DUBROVSKY EVGENY V [SU], et al) [A] 1,26 * figure 5 *
by applicantJPS58140597
 JPH09196595