blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0974434 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0974434



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 244
20.02.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
06.03.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.02.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
03.02.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
03.02.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
27.01.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 9
07.10.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
07.10.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
07.10.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 31
06.08.2002 Claims Search / examination 5
06.08.2002 Claims Search / examination 3
06.08.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
01.08.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 11
19.04.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
19.04.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.01.2002 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
09.01.2002 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
04.01.2002 Invitation to pay examination fee/designation fees with additional fee Search / examination 2
15.05.2001 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
23.03.2001 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
23.03.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.03.2001 European search report Search / examination 3
07.11.2000 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
31.10.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
31.10.2000 Partial European search report Search / examination 3
31.08.2000 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
01.07.2000 Request for accelerated search Search / examination 1
22.06.2000 Request for accelerated search Search / examination 1
31.01.2000 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
31.01.2000 Priority document Search / examination 33
22.12.1999 Invitation to file priority document Search / examination 1
15.12.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
30.11.1999 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
17.11.1999 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
02.11.1999 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
27.09.1999 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
27.09.1999 Priority document Search / examination 41
06.08.1999 Drawings Search / examination 15
06.08.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
23.07.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.07.1999 Claims Search / examination 3
23.07.1999 Description Search / examination 14
23.07.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
23.07.1999 Drawings Search / examination 15
23.07.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
23.07.1999 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
23.07.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7