blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0974434


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.09.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.10.2008  [2008/42]
28.01.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.03.2005  [2005/11]
26.11.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.01.2005  [2005/02]
17.09.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.11.2004  [2004/45]
20.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.10.2004  [2004/41]
13.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.09.2004  [2004/40]
06.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.09.2004  [2004/39]
16.07.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.09.2004  [2004/36]
21.05.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.07.2004  [2004/28]
23.04.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.06.2004  [2004/24]
20.02.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  07.04.2004  [2004/15]
12.12.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.01.2004  [2004/05]
21.11.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.01.2004  [2004/02]
28.02.2003 (Expected) grant published on  16.04.2003  [2003/16]
07.02.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.09.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
14.08.2002 Examination report or reply
31.07.2002 Renewal fee
19.04.2002 First examination report
17.04.2002 Examination report or reply
10.04.2002 Change - extension states
01.02.2002 Request for examination filed published on  20.03.2002  [2002/12]
31.01.2002 Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973)
27.12.2001 Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973)
14.12.2001 Definitive list of designations published on  30.01.2002  [2002/05]
02.08.2001 Renewal fee
23.03.2001 Publication of search report published on  09.05.2001 [2001/19]
21.10.2000 Change - classification published on  06.12.2000 [2000/49]
21.07.2000 Request for accelerated examination
17.12.1999 Change - inventor published on  02.02.2000 [2000/05]
11.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]