blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0974434
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU4109199 17.02.2000A
Priority number Date
US9408298 24.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0974434Global Dossier 16.04.2003B1
EP0974434 09.05.2001A3
EP0974434 26.01.2000A2
Priority number Date
US35472299 16.07.1999
US9408298 24.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT237437T 15.05.2003T
Priority number Date
US35472299 16.07.1999
US9408298 24.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2278934 24.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
US35472299 16.07.1999
US9408298 24.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69906891T 04.12.2003T2
DE69906891D 22.05.2003D1
Priority number Date
US35472299 16.07.1999
US9408298 24.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK0974434T 02.06.2003T3
Priority number Date
US35472299 16.07.1999
US9408298 24.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6263979 24.07.2001B1
Priority number Date
US35472299 16.07.1999
US9408298 24.07.1998