Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974434

EP0974434 - Interchangeable implement system for power tools [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 15.10.2008  [2008/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Black & Decker Inc.
Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway
Newark, DE 19711 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Black & Decker Inc.
Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway
Newark Delaware 19711 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Dyke, Colin
RRNo. 2, North Augusta
Ontario K0G 1RO / CA
02 / Edleblute, Calvin
16722 Green Valley Court
Stewartstown, Pennsylvania 17363 / US
03 / Lessig, William
1118 Piney Hill Road
Monkton, Maryland 21111 / US
04 / Meloni, Robert
5 Halbrook Court
Baltimore, Maryland 21236 / US
05 / Vantran, John
6 Twin Oaks Court
Parton, Maryland 21120 / US
06 / Wagster, Robert
5219 Catalpha Road
Baltimore, Maryland 21214 / US
[2000/05]
Former [2000/04]01 / Dyke, Colin
RRNo. 2, North Augusta
Ontario K0G 1RO / CA
02 / Edleblute, Calvin
RDNo. 3, Box 229
Stewartstown, Pennsylvania 17363 / US
03 / Lessig, William
1118 Piney Hill Road
Monkton, Maryland 21111 / US
04 / Meloni, Robert
5 Halbrook Court
Baltimore, Maryland 21236 / US
05 / Vantran, John
6 Twin Oaks Court
Parton, Maryland 21120 / US
06 / Wagster, Robert
5219 Catalpha Road
Baltimore, Maryland 21214 / US
Representative(s)Dlugosz, Anthony Charles , et al
Black & Decker Europe
European Group Headquarters
210 Bath Road
Slough
Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Dlugosz, Anthony Charles , et al
Black & Decker Europe European Group Headquarters 210 Bath Road
Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
Application number, filing date99305839.523.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateUS19980094082P24.07.1998         Original published format: US 94082 P
US1999035472216.07.1999         Original published format: US 354722
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974434
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974434
Date:09.05.2001
[2001/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974434
Date:16.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:B27B17/00, B25F5/02
[2000/49]
Former International [2000/04]B27B17/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:Werkzeugauswechselsystem für Motorwerkzeuge[2000/04]
English:Interchangeable implement system for power tools[2000/04]
French:Système d'outils interchangéable pour outils motorisés[2000/04]
Examination procedure01.07.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
09.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/12]
19.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.2002Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
01.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2003Fee for grant paid
27.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
04.01.2002M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE16.04.2003
CH16.04.2003
FI16.04.2003
LI16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
AT23.07.2003
CY23.07.2003
GB23.07.2003
IE23.07.2003
LU23.07.2003
SE24.07.2003
DK31.07.2003
FR31.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
[2008/42]
Former [2005/11]BE16.04.2003
CH16.04.2003
FI16.04.2003
LI16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
AT23.07.2003
CY23.07.2003
GB23.07.2003
IE23.07.2003
LU23.07.2003
SE24.07.2003
DK31.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2005/02]BE16.04.2003
CH16.04.2003
FI16.04.2003
LI16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
CY23.07.2003
GB23.07.2003
IE23.07.2003
LU23.07.2003
SE24.07.2003
DK31.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/45]BE16.04.2003
CH16.04.2003
FI16.04.2003
LI16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
CY23.07.2003
GB23.07.2003
IE23.07.2003
LU23.07.2003
SE24.07.2003
DK31.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/41]BE16.04.2003
CH16.04.2003
FI16.04.2003
LI16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
CY23.07.2003
IE23.07.2003
LU23.07.2003
SE24.07.2003
DK31.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/40]BE16.04.2003
CH16.04.2003
FI16.04.2003
LI16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
CY23.07.2003
IE23.07.2003
LU23.07.2003
SE24.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/39]BE16.04.2003
CH16.04.2003
FI16.04.2003
LI16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
CY23.07.2003
LU23.07.2003
SE24.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/36]BE16.04.2003
CH16.04.2003
FI16.04.2003
LI16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
CY23.07.2003
SE24.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/28]BE16.04.2003
CH16.04.2003
FI16.04.2003
LI16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE24.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/24]CH16.04.2003
FI16.04.2003
LI16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE24.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/05]CH16.04.2003
FI16.04.2003
LI16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/02]CH16.04.2003
LI16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5033552  (HU CHENG-TE [TW]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4-7;
 [XA]US5687483  (NEUBERT WERNER [DE], et al) [X] 8-16 * the whole document * [A] 7