EP0974450 - Window bags and a method of manufacture thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2001 [2001/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gala International Group Farrier House, 223 High Street Henley in Arden Warwickshire B95 5BG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states Gala International Group Farrier House, 223 High Street Henley in Arden, Warwickshire B95 5BG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Law, Timothy 64 Gillbent Road Cheadlehulme, Cheshire SK8 6FJ / GB | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Kinton, Colin David Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road, Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | Kinton, Colin David Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road, Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99305853.6 | 23.07.1999 | [2000/04] | Priority number, date | GB19980015991 | 23.07.1998 Original published format: GB 9815991 | [2000/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0974450 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0974450 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B31B19/82, B31B39/00 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
B31B70/00 (EP);
B31B70/826 (EP,US);
B31B2155/00 (EP);
B31B2160/10 (EP);
B31B2170/20 (EP);
B31B70/81 (EP);
B31B70/82 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/04] | B31B19/82 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/02] |
Former [2000/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fenstersack und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2000/04] | English: | Window bags and a method of manufacture thereof | [2000/04] | French: | Sac à fenêtre et son procédé de production | [2000/04] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/46] | 30.03.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.12.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5410857 (UTLEY WAYNE S [US]) [X] 1-8,10 * column 4, line 3 - line 46; figure - *; | [A]EP0765744 (POLICARTA SRL [IT]) [A] 1,8 * claims 14,15 * |