Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977060

EP0977060 - Front panel for display [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.07.2006
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.08.2006  [2006/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited
27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8260 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/01]For all designated states
Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited
27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8260 / JP
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome
Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Honda, Satoshi
2-1-1036, Kubota-cho
Niihama-shi, Ehime / JP
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Nicholls, Michael John
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Nicholls, Michael John
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date99305947.627.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateJP1998021259028.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21259098
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0977060
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0977060
Date:30.08.2000
[2000/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:G02B5/20, G02F1/1335, H01J29/89, H01J17/49, G02B5/22
[2000/36]
Former International [2000/05]G02B5/20, G02F1/1335, H01J29/89, H01J17/49
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/20]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Frontscheibe für Anzeige[2000/05]
English:Front panel for display[2000/05]
French:Panneau avant pour afficheur[2000/05]
Examination procedure16.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/16]
28.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/32]
29.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US3298959  (MARKS ALVIN M, et al) [X] 1 * figure 6 *;
 [X]US5645461  (IWASAKI YASUO [JP]) [X] 1 * figure 5 *;
 [DYA]WO9823980  (HOECHST CELANESE CORP [US]) [DY] 1 * abstract * [A] 3-8;
 [Y]GB727140  (GEN ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1 * page 4, line 55 - line 89 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [DA]JPS59214837  ;
 [DA]JPH10128898  ;
 [DA]JPH09241520
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850416), vol. 009, no. 086, Database accession no. (P - 349), [DA] 1 * abstract *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, [DA] 1 * abstract *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, [DA] 1 * abstract *