Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978789

EP0978789 - Apparatus, method and system for upgrading a device with an incompatible processor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.07.2002
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.09.2002  [2002/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Newer Technology, Inc.
4848 Irving Street
Wichita, KS 67209 / US
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Hinshaw, Darryl R.
11020 Rolling Hills
Wichita, KS 67217 / US
02 / Runyan, Larry J.
9911 Autumn Chase
Wichita, KS 67206 / US
03 / Mickaelian, Ben B.
8507 Parkmont Dr.
Wichita, KS 67207 / US
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Nicholls, Michael John
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Nicholls, Michael John
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date99305949.227.07.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateUS1998012952305.08.1998         Original published format: US 129523
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0978789
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/42, G06F13/40
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung, Verfahren und System zur Verbesserung eines Gerätes mit einem inkompatiblen Prozessor[2000/06]
English:Apparatus, method and system for upgrading a device with an incompatible processor[2000/06]
French:Dispositif, procédé et système d'amélioration des performances d'un appareil avec un processeur incompatible[2000/06]
Examination procedure01.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/37]
10.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/37]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200103   M06   Not yet paid