Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976499

EP0976499 - Strength-enhancing apparatus for metal part [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.01.2005  [2005/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Honda Giken Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ichihashi, Satoru, c/o Honda Engineering KK
10-1, Shinsayama 1-chome
Sayama-shi, Saitama-ken 350-1381 / JP
02 / Ito, Yutaka, c/o Honda Engineering KK
10-1, Shinsayama 1-chome
Sayama-shi, Saitama-ken 350-1381 / JP
03 / Ohno, Masaichi, c/o Honda Engineering KK
10-1, Shinsayama 1-chome
Sayama-shi, Saitama-ken 350-1381 / JP
04 / Watanabe, Shigeru, c/o Honda Engineering KK
10-1, Shinsayama 1-chome
Sayama-shi, Saitama-ken 350-1381 / JP
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Jenkins, Peter David , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Jenkins, Peter David , et al
PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Application number, filing date99305969.027.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateJP1998021327228.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21327298
JP1998021328928.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21328998
JP1998021329128.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21329198
JP1998021329428.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21329498
JP1999011680823.04.1999         Original published format: JP 11680899
JP1999011681623.04.1999         Original published format: JP 11681699
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976499
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976499
Date:14.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:B24C9/00, B24C1/10
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/42]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gerät zur Steigerung der Festigkeit von Metallteilen[2000/05]
English:Strength-enhancing apparatus for metal part[2000/05]
French:Appareil pour augmenter la résistance de pièces métalliques[2000/05]
Examination procedure28.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
04.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.2003Fee for grant paid
11.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2318077  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9,12-17,19,22,25-29 * page 6, line 19 - page 8, line 3 * * page 15, line 7 - line 22 * * page 16, line 25 - page 20, line 19 * * page 21, line 14 - line 25; figures 1-7 *;
 [AD]JPH09248765  ;
 [AD]JPH09248761  ;
 [A]US3383803  (SCHULTE HAROLD F, et al) [A] 1,3,9-12,18-22 * column 5, line 34 - line 50; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0144237  (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1,3,9-12,18-24 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19531665  (ABREX OBERFLAECHENTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 9-12,18-24 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5272897  (WERN MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 1,7-9,16-22,28,29 * column A * * column 1, line 7 - line 14; figures 1-3 *
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 98, no. 1, [AD] 1,3,7,9,12,18,19,22 * abstract *
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 98, no. 1, [AD] 1,3,7,9,12,16,17,19,28,29 * abstract *