Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976744

EP0976744 - Amide, carbamate, and urea derivatives having glutamate receptor function potentiating activity [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.06.2005
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.08.2005  [2005/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Arnold, Macklin Brian
6667 North Lawson Road
Morgantown, Indiana 46160 / US
02 / Bleisch, Thomas John
318 Scarborough Way
Noblesville, Indiana 46060 / US
03 / Ornstein, Paul Leslie
10441 Bosahan Court
Carmel, Indiana 46032 / US
04 / Zarrinmayeh, Hamideh
924 Sable Run
Carmel, Indiana 46032 / US
05 / Zimmerman, Dennis Michael
10343 Oak Ridge Drive
Zionsville, Indiana 46077 / US
06 / Bender, David Michael
5744 Wyckfield Way
Indianapolis, Indiana 46220 / US
07 / Jones, Winton Dennis
1227 East 126th Street
Carmel, Indiana 46033 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Denholm, Anna Marie , et al
Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Center Erl Wood Manor Windlesham
Surrey GU20 6PH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Denholm, Anna Marie , et al
Eli Lilly and Company Limited, Lilly Research Center, Erl Wood Manor
Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB
Application number, filing date99305981.528.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateUS19980094997P31.07.1998         Original published format: US 94997 P
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976744
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication 
No.:EP0976744
Date:03.05.2000
[2000/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07D333/20, A61K31/38, C07D333/24, C07C233/05, C07C271/14, C07C271/10, C07C275/24, A61K31/325, A61K31/17, A61K31/16
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
Extension statesAL09.08.1999
LT09.08.1999
LV09.08.1999
RO09.08.1999
SI09.08.1999
TitleGerman:Amid-, Carbamat- und Harnstoffderivate mit Glutamaterezeptorfunktion stimulierender Wirkung[2000/05]
English:Amide, carbamate, and urea derivatives having glutamate receptor function potentiating activity[2000/05]
French:Dérivés amides, de carbamates et de l'urée ayant une activité stimulatrice de la fonction des récepteurs de glutamate[2000/05]
Examination procedure09.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
29.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/31]
07.03.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0825164  (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [X] 1-4,6-13 * page 5, compounds of formula I *;
 [X]EP0816309  (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [X] 1,5-13 * page 5, compounds of formula I *;
 [A]WO9402475  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9739750  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [X]US3729475  (WILLIAMSON W, et al) [X] 1,2,6-14,17,18 * columns 1-2 *;
 [X]GB2181728  (INDIAN DRUGS & PHARMA) [X] 1,2,7-9,13,14 * claim 1 *;
 [X]US5420158  (YOUS SAID [FR], et al) [X] 1,3,5-12,14 * columns 1-2 *;
 [X]WO9610559  (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [X] 1,5-12,14 * claim 1 *;
 [X]US5441984  (HEATH JR WILLIAM F [US], et al) [X] 1,5-12,14 * columns 1-2 *;
 [X]DE2329037  (BASF AG) [X] 1,2,6-14 * claim 1 *;
 [X]DE2228216  (SCIENCE UNION & CIE) [X] 1,2,6-9,11-14 * claim 1 *;
 [X]US4010279  (GRISS GERHART, et al) [X] 1-3,6-12,14 * columns 1-2 *;
 [X]US3043868  (PETER KRIMMEL CARL) [X] 1,2,7,12,14 * column 1 *;
 [X]DE1238455  (TROPONWERKE DINKLAGE & CO) [X] 1,5-12,14 * claim 1 *;
 [X]GB933168  (SMITH KLINE FRENCH LAB) [X] 1,4,6-10,14 * page 1 *;
 [X]EP0757982  (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]) [X] 1,2,6-12,14 * claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0591057  (ADIR [FR]) [X] 1,5-12,14,17,18 * claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0810220  (PFIZER [US]) [X] 1,2,6-14,17-20 * claim 1 *;
 [X]US4465509  (TAKEMATSU TETSUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,7,12 * columns 1-2 *;
 [PXD]WO9833496  (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [PXD] 1,4,6-14 * page 80 *
 [X]  - TRIVEDI B K ET AL, "INHIBITORS OF ACYL-COA:CHOLESTEROL ACYLTRANSFERASE. 4. A NOVEL SERIES OF UREA ACAT INHIBITORS AS POTENTIAL HYPOCHOLESTEROLEMIC AGENTS", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (19930101), vol. 36, no. 22, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 3300 - 3307, XP000617639 [X] 1,5-12,14 * page 3302; table III *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00074a011
 [X]  - ADZHIBEKYAN ET AL., "C-arylcycloalkyl- and Narylcycloalkyl-substituted barbituric acids", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19770606), vol. 86, no. 23, Database accession no. 171375, XP002118971 [X] 1,5-9,11,12 * abstract *