Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977043

EP0977043 - Broad dynamic range RMS measurement method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.10.2005
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.12.2005  [2005/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FLUKE CORPORATION
P.O. Box 9090
Everett, WA 98206-9090 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
FLUKE CORPORATION
P.O. Box 9090
Everett, Washington 98206-9090 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Swift, Steven D.
c/o Fluke Corporation, PO Box 9090
Everett, Washington 98206-9090 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Burke, Steven David , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Burke, Steven David , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date99305986.428.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateUS1998012698730.07.1998         Original published format: US 126987
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977043
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977043
Date:15.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01R19/02, G01R15/12
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/42]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Effektivwertmessen von Signalen mit breitem dynamischen Bereich[2000/05]
English:Broad dynamic range RMS measurement method[2000/05]
French:Procédé pour mesurer la valeur efficace d'un signal à grande plage dynamique[2000/05]
Examination procedure02.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/26]
05.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.2004Fee for grant paid
15.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US3657528  (PLANTE LAWRENCE M) [X] 21,22 * abstract * * figures 1,7 *;
 [A]US3807816  (HAMBURG J) [A] 1,6,10,14 * abstract * * column 1, line 20 - line 44 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4933631  (ECCLESTON LARRY E [US]) [A] 1,6,10,14 * abstract * * figure 2 *;
 [A]  SOUSA J L, "VOLTAGE LIMITER RESTRAINS FAST OP AMPS", EDN ELECTRICAL DESIGN NEWS,US,CAHNERS PUBLISHING CO. NEWTON, MASSACHUSETTS, vol. 33, no. 7, ISSN 0012-7515, page 198,200, XP000054261 [A] 1,6,10,14 * figure 1A *
 [A]  PESSEN D ET AL, "ACCURATE ANALOG LIMITING CIRCUITS", INSTRUMENTS AND CONTROL SYSTEMS,US,CHILTON COMPANY. RADNOR, vol. 44, no. 1, page 13, XP002073171 [A] 1,6,10,14 * figure 4 *