Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977464

EP0977464 - Audio signal processing circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.07.2009
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.08.2009  [2009/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Onkyo Corporation
2-1, Nisshin-cho Neyagawa-shi
Osaka 572-8540 / JP
[2008/37]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Onkyo Corporation
2-1, Nisshin-cho
Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-8540 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kasai, Joji
c/o Onkyo Corp., 2-1, Nisshin-cho
Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-8540 / JP
02 / Nakatake, Tetsuro
c/o Onkyo Corp., 2-1, Nisshin-cho
Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-8540 / JP
03 / Takemura, Kazumasa
c/o Onkyo Corp., 2-1, Nisshin-cho
Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-8540 / JP
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date99306038.329.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateJP1998021792931.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21792998
JP1998021821831.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21821898
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0977464
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0977464
Date:13.04.2005
[2005/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977464
Date:10.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.2005
ClassificationInternational:H04S1/00
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2006/01]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Tonsignalverarbeitungsschaltung[2000/05]
English:Audio signal processing circuit[2000/05]
French:Circuit de traitement du signal sonore[2000/05]
Examination procedure03.08.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.08.2005Examination requested  [2005/43]
14.10.2005Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
15.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.02.2006Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
08.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
14.07.2008Fee for grant paid
14.07.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05076372.1  / EP1571883
Opposition(s)11.06.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
14.07.2008Request for further processing filed
14.07.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
18.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
19.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
18.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
18.11.2005AT   M01   Not yet paid
18.11.2005BE   M01   Not yet paid
18.11.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
18.11.2005CY   M01   Not yet paid
18.11.2005DK   M01   Not yet paid
18.11.2005ES   M01   Not yet paid
18.11.2005FI   M01   Not yet paid
18.11.2005FR   M01   Not yet paid
18.11.2005GR   M01   Not yet paid
18.11.2005IE   M01   Not yet paid
18.11.2005IT   M01   Not yet paid
18.11.2005LU   M01   Not yet paid
18.11.2005MC   M01   Not yet paid
18.11.2005NL   M01   Not yet paid
18.11.2005PT   M01   Not yet paid
18.11.2005SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5033092  (SADAIE KOICHI [JP]) [A] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * * column 5, line 38 - column 6, line 9; figures 1,4 *;
 [A]US4817162  (KIHARA HISASHI [JP]) [A] 1-3,5,6 * the whole document *;
 [DA]JPH08265899  ;
 [XY]US5333200  (COOPER DUANE H [US], et al) [X] 7-9,14-16 * abstract * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 16 * * column 8, line 15 - line 49; figure 1C * * column 14, line 6 - column 17, line 23; figures 6A,6B,6C * [Y] 10;
 [A]EP0699012  (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 7-9,11,16 * abstract * * page 8, line 39 - page 10, line 47; figure 1 *;
 [Y]JPH07143600  ;
 [X]EP0347394  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 15 * the whole document *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, [DA] 4 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 1995, no. 09, [Y] 10 * abstract *
 [A]  - KUO S M ET AL, "DUAL-CHANNEL AUDIO EQUALIZATION AND CROSS-TALK CANCELLATION FOR 3-DSOUND REPRODUCTION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199711), vol. 43, no. 4, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 1189 - 1196, XP000768573 [A] 7,8,11,16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.642386